Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Thomas, Ingrid Grace, against Ariel Salgado, Cecilia Salgado, Citifinancial Equity Services, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with MITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-F |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO US BANK ETC BK 14746 PG 1745 | |
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $130.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 551589 | |
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID ISSUED TO US BANK ETC BK 14746 PG 1744 | |
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMOUNT $100 BOOK 14740 PAGE 473-474 | |
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | COPY MAILED NOS TO ATTY MARSHALL C. WATSON | |
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 12/22/2008 11:00 L 8, B 21, CEDAR HILLS ESTATES UN 2 | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL RECORDED MORTGAGE, AND ORIGINAL RECORDED ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 14706 PAGE 1685-1689 | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.