Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company, filed a(n) case represented by Kolev, Nikolay Sergeev, against Davey Morris, Morris Investment Property, Unknown Beneficiaries Of The Land Trust No 6010-6012, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with NACHMAN, BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST CO AMERICAS AS TRUSTEE OR BK 14816 PG 886 | |
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $130.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 616055 | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BOOK 14792 PAGE 2252-2253 | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 02/25/2009 11:00 AM PT L13 B34 ORTEGA FARMS SUBDIVISION AKA 6010 NORA RD, JAX, FL 32244 | |
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (SUMMARY) OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 14761 PAGE 43-48 | |
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MTG AND ASSIGMENT OF MTG | |
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGMENT OF MTG | |
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.