Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Paglino, Joseph Salvatore, against Kenneth Cochran, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with MITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-F |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT SUMMARY BOOK 15159 PAGE 2279-2279 | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING RESETTING, 02092010 AT 210PM | |
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 01282010, 330 PM., ROOM 206 | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER KENNETH COCHRAN 04/23/2008 | |
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO KENNETH COCHRAN, 04092008-133705 | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $256.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 285970 | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ISSUED 1 | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.