Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Higdon, Sheila Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Collins, James Ullom Iii, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFEAGLE, MARK EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 5/30/2023 at 1000 AM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING FOR MAY 30, 2023 @ 10:00AM | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/11/2023 at 1030 AM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ORE TENUS MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND ORDER RESETTING HEARING VIA VIDEO | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 12/15/2022 at 1030 AM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING 12/15/2022 @ 10:30AM | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MX 2022003473 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.