Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Department Child Support Enfor, Willis, Heather, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Schneider, Pamela A, against Scott, Anthony Dean, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFEAGLE, MARK EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE OBJECTION TO DORS AMENDED MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TRANSFER CASE FOR TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER AND DORS MOTION TO RESERVE JURISDICTION AND TO AUTHORIZE DETERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPOR | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Pamela Ann Schneider Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED DORS AMENDED MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TRANSFER CASE FOR DETERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT BY THE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PETITIONER'S CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEETS AND PROPOSED PARENTING PLAN | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER PETITIONER/MOTHER'S ANSWER TO RESPONDENTS AMENDED COUNTER PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND GRANTING FATHERS ORE TENUS MOTION TO CONTINUE THE NON JURY TRAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.