Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Calvert, Thomas Leon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Calvert, Joyce Lee, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, JENNIFER R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | VS FORM | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Event DISS HEARING scheduled on 1/25/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge Jennifer Griffin presiding. | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Scheduling Hearing 01/25/2022 @ 9AM | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 152021DR000327DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/23/2021 | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2021003765 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.