Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Brannin, Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brannin, Julie, represented by Watson, Chana Marie, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | VS FORM | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO CHILDERN | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/2/2021 at 0400 PM, MX - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 11/02/21 @ 4:00PM | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT- EMAILED TO ATTORNEY 10/04/2021 | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
September 11, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN(S) OF SERVICE SERVED 09/11/2021 @ 8:45AM | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILIBILITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.