Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wallace, Santiago M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Lopez, Christy, against Wallace, Elizabeth A, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ORDER CLARIFYING JUDGMENT AND GRANTING CONTEMPT | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - COPY OF VOIDED CHECK | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/16/2023 at 1000 AM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 08/16/2023 @ 10AM | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION STIPULATED MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CIVIL CONT/ENF - FILED BY MR. WALLACE | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number MX 2023001312 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.