Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Moore, Robert Allen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moore, Misty Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE AND QUITCLAIM DEED FROM RESPONDENT | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | VS FORM | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/18/2021 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING 11/18/2021 @ 10:30AM | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/18/2021 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING 11/18/21 @ 11:00AM | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - PETITIONER | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.