Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hillard, Ronda K., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Watson, Chana Marie, against Hillard, Kevin A., in the jurisdiction of Dixie County, FL, . Dixie County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDixie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | VS FORM | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE PETITIONER'S DRIVER LICENSE - ISSUE DATE 03/20/2020 | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 7/14/2021 at 0330 PM, MX - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 07/14/2021 @ 3:30PM | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER,WAIVER, & REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUD. DI | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN(S) OF SERVICE | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2021001798 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.