Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Westfall, Judy, Westfall, Roger, filed a(n) Other case represented by Constable, James Scott, against American Integrity Insurance C, represented by Riordan, John Skyler, in the jurisdiction of Desoto County, FL, . Desoto County, FL Superior Courts with HALL, DON THOMAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHALL, DON THOMAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2024 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDesoto County, FL |
|
This complaint is a civil action filed by Roger Westfall and Judy Westfall against American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida. The plaintiffs allege that they owned a property located at 12543 SW Kings Row, Lake Suzy, DeSoto County, FL 34269, re...
CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: February 14, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED- AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: February 14, 2024DEFENDANT MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: March 19, 2024DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS
Date: February 14, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MA 120737 | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED- AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 142024CA000092CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/14/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.