Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Delgado, Ricardo Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramirez, Mari Adela C, in the jurisdiction of Desoto County, FL, . Desoto County, FL Superior Courts with HALL, DON THOMAS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDesoto County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FILED (RESP) | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE (RESP) | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION (RESP) | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | FORM A-SENT TO KATHY FOR REVIEW | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ATTEND SEMINAR FOR DIVORCING PARENTS AND ORDER SETTING TIME LIMIT FOR COMPLETION | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NEEDS LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (PET) | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | FORM A-SENT TO KATHY FOR REVIEW | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION (PET) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.