Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Merrill, Ann K, against Dolores Thomas, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time471 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY WITH SAME ATTORNEY INFORMATION RECEIVED AND FILED Not Applicable |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINITFF VACATED |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
KURTISS A JACOBS CHANGES ATTORNEY FOR MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC AND IS REPLACED BY ANN K MERRILL Not Applicable |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEYS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM FOR PLAINTIFF. Not Applicable |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL: 04/19/10 OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT Not Applicable |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 4/01/10 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 29 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.