Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Smith, Kim, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Desoto County, FL, . Desoto County, FL Superior Courts with HALL, DON THOMAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHALL, DON THOMAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDesoto County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE F/R INST#202214006087 | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT-HUSBAND | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $392.50 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $392.50 Receipt Number MA 99841 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.