Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Betancourt, Ysabel, Kht Family Lp, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Ostrzenski, Bartosz Adam, against Betancourt, Ysabel, La Tires Sales N Services Inc, Tenant, Unknown, in the jurisdiction of Desoto County, FL, . Desoto County, FL Superior Courts with HALL, DON THOMAS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDesoto County, FL |
|
SUMMONS ISSUED (UNK TEN #1)
Date: November 16, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (YSABEL BETANCOURT)
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE, AS SERVED (LA TIRES)
Date: January 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED 12/30/22 (YSABEL BENTANCOURT)
Date: January 06, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 16, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT FORE FORECLOSURE & BREACH OF GUARANTY
Date: November 16, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS RCVD BY YOSBEL GONZALEZ 12/12/22
Date: January 06, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED (LA TIRES)
Date: November 16, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED 12/12/22 (UNK TEN #1)
Date: January 06, 2023MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED
Date: January 06, 2023RESPONSE FROM YSABEL BETANCOURT
Date: February 15, 2023MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING :8/8/23 @10:30am (VIA ZOOM)
Date: June 13, 2023NOT AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: July 12, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING:8/8/23
Date: August 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING:8/8/23 | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOT AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING :8/8/23 @10:30am (VIA ZOOM) | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING-7/12/23 AT 2:30PM | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE FROM YSABEL BETANCOURT | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE, AS SERVED (LA TIRES) | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED 12/30/22 (YSABEL BENTANCOURT) | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE, AS NON SERVED (YSABEL BENTANCOURT, AS PERS GUAR & UNK TEN #1) | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS RCVD BY YOSBEL GONZALEZ 12/12/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.