Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Diaz, Roy Alan, against Anthony, Gloria A, Lake Suzy Property Owners Asso, Mortgage Electronic Registrati, Unknown Tenant No 1, Unknown Tenant No 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Desoto County, FL, . Desoto County, FL Superior Courts with FLOWERS, GUY ALAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFLOWERS, GUY ALAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDesoto County, FL |
|
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS F/R INST #
Date: June 03, 2022REPORT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT & ORDER
Date: June 03, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: June 03, 2022ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER
Date: June 03, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (GLORIA ANTHONY)
Date: June 03, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (LAKE SUZY PROPERTY)
Date: June 03, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (MORTGAGE ELECT REG)
Date: June 03, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: June 03, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (UNK TEN #2)
Date: June 03, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (UNK TEN #1)
Date: June 03, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED & MAILED TO ATTY FOR PUB
Date: October 07, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: November 04, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: July 19, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: December 27, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT-DEFAULT ISSUED
Date: December 27, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: December 27, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE (MORT ELECTRONIC REG) RCVD BY MONICA MYRICK 6/20/22
Date: September 20, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE (GLORIA ANTHONY) RETURNED NOT FOUND 6/21/22
Date: September 20, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK TEN #1) SUMMONS RETURNED NOT FOUND 6/21/22
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS AS TO ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: January 04, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE (LAKE SUZY PROP OWNERS ASSOC) SUMMONS RCVD BY CYNTHIA CASSAZA 6/20/22
Date: September 20, 2022DIRECTIONS TO CLERK
Date: September 22, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK TEN #2) SUMMONS RETURNED NOT FOUND 6/21/22
Date: September 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FILED
Date: September 22, 2022AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: February 17, 2023NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: February 17, 2023NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REAONABLENESS AS TO ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: February 23, 2023NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS
Date: March 29, 2023PROPOSED
Date: March 29, 2023BID SHEET
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF SALE :5/25/23 @11AM (ISSUED BY ATTY)
Date: April 21, 2023UNIFORM FINAL JUDGEMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE:5/25/23 @11AM F/R INST #202314004057
Date: April 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: May 25, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: June 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF TITLE F/R INST #202314005912
Date: June 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE F/R INST #202314005912 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MA 111486 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | BID SHEET | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE :5/25/23 @11AM (ISSUED BY ATTY) | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.