Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Peachtree Settlement Funding L, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Petitt, Richard Thomas, against Berkshire Hathaway Life Ins Co, Bhg Structured Settlements Inc, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2024 |
CategoryOther-Business Transactions |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 12, 2024APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS
Date: March 12, 2024NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/30/2024 at 1000 AM, JC - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number CC 247243 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 122024CA000088CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/12/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.