Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Crews, Gina A, Crews, Robert C, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Abbass, Mohad, against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co, represented by Ortiz Figueroa, Pedro M., in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2024 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Robert C. Crews and Gina A. Crews against Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Third Judicial Circuit in and for Columbia County, Florida. The Plaintiffs seek damages in exces...
PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 06, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 06, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 06, 2024CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES
Date: March 21, 2024NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: March 06, 2024DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE
Date: March 06, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 06, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: March 06, 2024PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 06, 2024REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION // PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 06, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS // PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 06, 2024NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES // NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (FOR NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 3/8/24 VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY) | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.