Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Parnell, Carolyn D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE (ADULT) | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINT, FDLE AND FBI RESULTS | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 9/19/2023 at 0930 AM, JC - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding. | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 122023DR000420DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/8/2023 | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number CC 236146 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.