Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Us Bank Trust Company National, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Meisels, Jonathan Ian, against Bennett, Shirley M, Unknown Spouse Of Shirley M Be, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
|
NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT.702.015(4) CERTIFICATION
Date: June 09, 2023PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: October 16, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: June 09, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHIRLEY M. BENNETT
Date: June 09, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 09, 2023RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS
Date: June 14, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 09, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: December 19, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHIRLEY M. BENNETT AKA SHIRLEY MAE BENNETT
Date: June 09, 2023NOTICE OF FILING THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: June 09, 2023VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2023ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: December 19, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/6/2023 at 0915 AM, JC - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding. | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS (ADDITIONAL TIME GRANTED, CLERK DID NOT EXECUTE DISMISSAL) | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTE TO DOCKET: PER THE GENERAL ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGES NO. 2023-10; EFFECTIVE 07/01/23 CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE OLIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.