Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Miller, Rebecca L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miller, Davis Jr, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event LACK OF PROS HRG on 10/2/2023 0130 PM Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS results CANCELLED on 8/22/2023 | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING AND ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/22/2023 at 1130 AM, JC - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding. | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.