Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Jp Morgan Mortgage Acquisition, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Vanslette, Jason Michael, against All Unknown Parties Claiming I, Hostetler, Bradley, Hostetler, Rachel, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryRp/Mf Homestead Residential $50,001-249,999 |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 05, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: July 05, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO RACHEL HOSTETELER
Date: July 05, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRADLEY HOSTETLER
Date: July 05, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RETURN CASE TO ACTIVE STATUS
Date: July 24, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: July 05, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: July 05, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: July 05, 2022PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: October 21, 2022DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS OF BRADLEY HOSTETLER
Date: February 24, 2023DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS OF RACHEL HOSTETLER
Date: March 01, 2023RETURN OF NON SERVICE -UKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: February 16, 2023ANSWER OF BRADLEY HOSTETLER
Date: February 24, 2023PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RETURN CASE TO ACTIVE STATUS
Date: July 19, 2023RETURN OF NON SERVICE -UKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: February 16, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: July 19, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE- RACHEL HOSTETLER ON 02/09/23 (INDV)
Date: February 16, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: July 25, 2023PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: August 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE- BRADLEY HOSTETLER ON 02/10/23 (INDV)
Date: February 16, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: July 26, 2023ANSWER OF RACHEL HOSTETLER
Date: March 01, 2023ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (GRANTED, CASE PLACED ON INACTIVE STATUS)
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REGARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: August 14, 2023NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: August 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: October 04, 2023ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 05, 2023GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S REPORT
Date: September 28, 2023AMENDED AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2024AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REGARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: January 05, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLENESS ATTORNEY'S FEE
Date: February 29, 2024FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: March 06, 2024NOTICE OF FILING (AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLENESS ATTORNEY'S FEES)
Date: February 29, 2024EMAIL FROM LAKE CITY REPORTER RE: REC'VD NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: March 22, 2024NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: March 21, 2024ORDER AD0PTING REPORT OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | EMAIL FROM LAKE CITY REPORTER RE: REC'VD NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTE TO DOCKET: THE NOTICE OF SALE HAS NOT BEEN PROVIDED TO THE CLERK FOR ISSUANCE (REC'VD 3/21/24 - THANK YOU) | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Event FORECLOSURE SALE scheduled on 7/17/2024 at 1100 AM, M1 - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLENESS ATTORNEY'S FEE | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING (AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLENESS ATTORNEY'S FEES) | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Event SUMMARY JUDGMENT HE scheduled on 3/5/2024 at 0300 PM, JC - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.