Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Brown-Hill, Deborah, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hill, Cleveland, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFEAGLE, MARK EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Event FH scheduled on 4/13/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding. | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $60.00 Receipt Number CC 184299 | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.