Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Espenship, Dewilton B Iii, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Robinson, Kris Bradshaw, against Espenship, Darilyn, Espenship, Dewilton B, Espenship, Joseph Mark, Espenship, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
|
RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-DEWILTON B ESPENSHIP IV (BRENDA ESPENSHIP, SPOUSE)-SUB 11/30/2015
Date: December 11, 2015ANSWER FROM DEFENDANTS JOSEPH ESPENSHIP AND DARILYN ESPENSHIP AND DEWITTON ESPENSHIP IV
Date: December 21, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-DARILYN ESPENSHIP (JOSEPH ESPENSHIP, SPOUSE) SUB 12/01/2015
Date: December 11, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED TO SCOTT ESPENSHIP
Date: November 25, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEWILTON B ESPENSHIP IV
Date: November 25, 2015NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 24, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-JOSEPH ESPENSHIP -IND 12/01/2015
Date: December 11, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED TO DARILYN ESPENSHIP
Date: November 25, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSEPH ESPENSHIP
Date: November 25, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED TO SCOTT ESPENSHIP 12/9/2015
Date: December 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event LACK OF PROS HRG on 2/7/2017 1000 AM Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS results CANCELLED on 11/18/2016 | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Event LACK OF PROS HRG scheduled on 2/7/2017 at 1000 AM, JC - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding. | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER FROM DEFENDANTS JOSEPH ESPENSHIP AND DARILYN ESPENSHIP AND DEWITTON ESPENSHIP IV | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED TO SCOTT ESPENSHIP 12/9/2015 | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-DEWILTON B ESPENSHIP IV (BRENDA ESPENSHIP, SPOUSE)-SUB 11/30/2015 | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-DARILYN ESPENSHIP (JOSEPH ESPENSHIP, SPOUSE) SUB 12/01/2015 | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-JOSEPH ESPENSHIP -IND 12/01/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.