Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcclain, Virginia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Demas, Thomas Theodore, against Lm Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Compa, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DIMISSAL | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AS TO DATE AND TIME) | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (VIRGINIA MCCLAIN) | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.