Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Herman, Beatrice, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Estate Of Herman Harris, Estate Of Mattie M. Prioleau, Estate Of William Harris, Estate Of James Harris, Clerk Of Court, Columbia Count, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWESLEY DOUGLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 5/2/2016 at 1000 AM, JC - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding. | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE EST OF JAMES HARRIS | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE EST OF WILLIAM HARRIS | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE EST OF MATTIE PRIOLEAU | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND NON MILIARY AFFIDAVIT AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE EST OF HERMAN HARRIS | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON LILLIE MAE FORD | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.