Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Springleaf Home Equity Inc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 37-D case represented by Clarfield, Steven Jay, against Clerk Of Court For The 3Rd Jud, Coleman, Joan Kay, Coleman, Tracy Lynn, Hamrick, Andrew C, The State Attorneys Office For, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, JULIAN E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLINS, JULIAN E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ST OF FLORIDA'S MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM ALL PRETRIAL MATTERS, TRIAL AND APPEARING AT SCHEDULED CONFERENCE | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 8/22/2014 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DEBORAH DENIKE presiding. | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDNG MOTIONS | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-SUMMONS SERVED 4-7-14 ON TRACY LYNN COLEMAN (SUB) | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-SUMMONS NON-SERVED 4-7-14 FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRACY LYNN COLEMAN | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-SUMMONS NON-SERVED 4-1-14 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.