Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Florida Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Stewart, Ricky E, Stewart, Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with JOHNSON, LEANDRA G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: May 29, 2013CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 03, 2012VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: December 03, 2012ANSWER FROM RICKY STEWART AND SUZANNE STEWART
Date: February 25, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICKY L STEWART
Date: December 21, 2012MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: March 29, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AS TO ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: March 29, 2013AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: March 29, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: March 29, 2013RECEIPT OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Date: June 27, 2013NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: April 18, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SUMMONS SERVED 1-31-13 SUZANNE STEWART (IND)
Date: February 25, 2013NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR 7/3/2013@11:00AM
Date: May 29, 2013NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: December 03, 2012MOTION TO CANCEL SALE VACATE JUDGMENT DISMISS ACTION AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS
Date: June 10, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUZANNE STEWART
Date: December 21, 2012AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF INDEPENDENT ATTORNEY AS TO ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: March 29, 2013ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: April 19, 2013NOTICE OF FILING(ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE)
Date: April 01, 2013FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET
Date: May 29, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING SALE VACATING JUDGMENT DISMISSING ACTION AND DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL SALE VACATE JUDGMENT DISMISS ACTION AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR 7/3/2013@11:00AM | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.