Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Merrill, Ann K, against Valerie Stewart, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Judith S. Craddick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions469 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 09 TO 21. Not Applicable |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 33 TO 09. Not Applicable |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 02 TO 33. Not Applicable |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. KURTISS A JACOBS SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC AND IS REPLACED BY ANN K MERRILL Not Applicable |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY THE COURT, TOGETHER WITH CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO MANN BRACKEN, LLP-FILED Not Applicable |
|
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes ORDERED |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT Not Applicable |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 4/01/10 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 29 | |
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT OSC ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.