Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deschuiteneer, Jeannette, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Creasey, Roy Melvin, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Request for Copies
Date:Request for Production
Date:Response to Motion
Date:Notice of Unavailability
Date:Motion to Compel -
Date:Request for Admissions
Date:Standing Order - Circuit
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non-parties | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel - | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Objection to Request of Production | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time - | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Objection to Interrogatories | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Objection to Request of Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.