Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Parks, Russell D, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Parks, Jeffrey G, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Unassigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryTrust Litigation |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Korn, Jason Hunter, Olson, Eric S for Jeffrey G Parks | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss by Jeffrey G Parks | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Parks, Jeffrey G, served 12/30/2019 | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Paid $10.00 on receipt 1076666, Fully Paid | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons issued | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;157456;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/0ab0efd9-1605-464f-8c5c-acd70a4f26f1/results/b7aff812-950b-41b0-812d-7b57ade7eb3f/lines/628e56ca-c1e0-4b0d-8199-245327ad4218/Doc Complaint |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Trust Litigation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.