Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Firewater Restoration Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Notice of Unavailability
Date:Motion to Compel -
Date:Notice of Compliance
Date:Standing Order - Circuit
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Taking Deposition | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company | |
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Taking Deposition | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
September 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Discovery - | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel - | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense by Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.