Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Wise Funding Group Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Swansons Electric Inc, Swanson, William J, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Approving Settlement and Dismissing Case Swansons Electric Inc, Swanson, William J Recorded 2019-11-19 Instrument# 5792116 | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Brodie, Lauren L | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Forsyth, Douglas William-Cameron (Plaintiff) | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Status Conference Held | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance/Non-Payment | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Status Conference @ 11:30 | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 11/15/2019 beginning at 11:00 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.