Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Tiaa Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Boye, Eric, Moreau, Marlene L, Unknown Parties In Possession 1, Unknown Parties In Possession 2, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Certificate of Title to Tiaa Fsb
Date: December 24, 2019Affidavit of Military Service for Moreau, Marlene L,Boye, Eric
Date: January 03, 2020Certificate of Disbursement $0.00
Date: December 24, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: January 03, 2020Paid $0.70 on receipt 1078236, Fully Paid
Date: December 17, 2019Correspondence to Clerk, from Counsel
Date: December 17, 2019Certificate of Sale to Tiaa Fsb
Date: December 12, 2019Bid Sheet $100.00 Plaintiff
Date: December 12, 2019Paid $70.00 on receipt 1077152, Balance Due: $0.70
Date: December 12, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: December 12, 2019Affidavit of Post Judgment Advances
Date: December 12, 2019Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale
Date: December 02, 2019Returned Mail
Date: November 15, 2019Correspondence to Judge, from Counsel
Date: November 07, 2019Confirmation of e-mail Received by Business Observer, regarding Publication
Date: November 08, 2019Notice of Foreclosure Sale
Date: November 08, 2019Final Judgment of Foreclosure Recorded 2019-11-08 Instrument# 5788385
Date: November 07, 2019Notice of Hearing for Motion For Summary Judgment @ 8:30Am
Date: September 23, 2019Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: August 29, 2019Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees
Date: August 16, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: August 16, 2019Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: August 06, 2019Affidavit as to Costs
Date: August 06, 2019Affidavit as to Hours
Date: August 06, 2019Notice Of Filing Original Mortgage
Date: August 02, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment - by Tiaa Fsb,
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Confidential Information Within Filing
Date: August 02, 2019Notice Of Filing Original Note
Date: August 02, 2019Notice of Filing Copy of Note and/or Mortgage
Date: August 01, 2019Notice of Confidential Information Within Filing
Date: August 01, 2019Motion for Clerk's Default
Date: July 19, 2019Default issued by clerk on Marlene L Moreau, Eric Boye
Date: July 23, 2019Proposed Clerk's Default
Date: July 19, 2019Affidavit of Military Service for Moreau, Marlene L,Boye, Eric
Date: July 17, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: July 17, 2019Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time for Service
Date: June 24, 2019Motion for Extension of Time -
Date: June 13, 2019Notice of Action With Mailing to Moreau, Marlene L,Boye, Eric on 05/30/2019
Date: May 29, 2019Affidavit/Certificate of Diligent Search Boye, Eric
Date: May 28, 2019Affidavit/Certificate of Diligent Search Moreau, Marlene L
Date: May 28, 2019Correspondence to Clerk, from Counsel
Date: May 28, 2019Return of Non-Service
Date: May 07, 2019Paid $1,945.00 on receipt 1003280, Fully Paid
Date: March 01, 2019Notice to Attorney of Writ of Possession Procedure Change
Date: February 28, 2019Summons issued
Date: February 28, 2019Real Property Valuation Sheet
Date: February 28, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: February 28, 2019Complaint
Date: February 28, 2019Certificate of Note Possession
Date: February 28, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 28, 2019Affidavit of Publication for Moreau, Marlene L, published 06/14/2019
Date: June 21, 2019Returned Mail
Date:Affidavit as to Costs
Date:Return of Non-Service
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Foster, Joseph G | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military Service for Moreau, Marlene L,Boye, Eric | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to Tiaa Fsb | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursement $0.00 | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Paid $0.70 on receipt 1078236, Fully Paid | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Correspondence to Clerk, from Counsel | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale to Tiaa Fsb | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet $100.00 Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.