Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midwestone Bank, filed a(n) case against All Unknown Parties, Fifth Third Mortgage Company, Oliveri, Elise, Oliveri, Gaspare, Smith, Carole H, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
|
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by MidwestOne Bank against Carole H. Smith and other defendants in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Collier County, Florida. MidwestOne Bank, as the successor by merger to Central Ban...
Notice of Unavailability
Date:Magistrate Status Report
Date:Cover Letter
Date:Notice Of Redemption
Date: July 11, 2019Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale
Date: June 28, 2019Confirmation of e-mail Received by Business Observer, regarding Publication
Date: April 29, 2019Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale
Date: April 26, 2019Notice of Foreclosure Sale
Date: April 26, 2019Order Cancelling and Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: April 24, 2019Notice of Hearing for Motion To Cancel And Reschedule Foreclosre Sale @ 8:30 A.M.
Date: April 24, 2019Motion to Cancel and Reschedule Foreclosure Sale -
Date: April 22, 2019Paid $50.00 on receipt 1013719, Fully Paid
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Foreclosure Sale
Date: April 04, 2019Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: April 03, 2019Cover Letter
Date: April 03, 2019Motion to Reschedule Foreclosure Sale -
Date: March 29, 2019Order Granting Substitution of Counsel for Midwestone Bank with Donnelly, Bradley Scott
Date: September 18, 2018Cover Letter
Date: September 18, 2018Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: August 22, 2018Stipulation/Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 15, 2018Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale
Date: August 10, 2018Confirmation of e-mail Received by Business Observer, regarding Publication
Date: July 24, 2018Notice of Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 23, 2018Final Judgment of Foreclosure Recorded 2018-07-24 Instrument# 5590002
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Filing and Original Promissory Note
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 05, 2018Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees
Date: May 29, 2018Affidavit as to Attorney Fees & Costs
Date: May 24, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment - by Midwestone Bank,
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Hearing for Motion For Summary Judgment Of Foreclosure
Date: May 24, 2018Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: May 22, 2018Magistrate Status Report
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Dropping Party Fifth Third Mortgage Company,
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant Carole H. Smith's Motion To Dismiss
Date: March 29, 2018Answer and Affirmative Defense by Carole H Smith
Date: March 29, 2018Motion to Dismiss by Fifth Third Mortgage Company
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Hearing for Motion To Dismiss @ 2:00
Date: March 06, 2018Motion to Dismiss by Carole H Smith
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of Default Not Entered
Date: February 20, 2018Cover Letter
Date: February 16, 2018Default issued by clerk on Elise Oliveri, Gaspare Oliveri
Date: February 19, 2018Affidavit of Military Service for Oliveri, Elise
Date: February 12, 2018Motion for Clerk's Default
Date: February 15, 2018Affidavit of Military Service for Oliveri, Gaspare
Date: February 12, 2018Cover Letter
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Default Not Entered
Date: February 12, 2018Cover Letter
Date: February 09, 2018Order Granting Extension of Time
Date: February 09, 2018Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by Carole H Smith
Date: January 31, 2018Motion for Clerk's Default
Date: February 08, 2018Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Stewart, Pamela for Carole H Smith
Date: January 31, 2018Affidavit of Military Service for Smith, Carole H
Date: January 25, 2018Return of Non-Service of Summons on Unknown Spouse Of Donna Lenski,
Date: January 24, 2018Return of Service of Summons on Unknown Tenant In Possession 2,, served 01/15/2018
Date: January 24, 2018Return of Service of Summons on Unknown Tenant In Possession 1,, served 01/15/2018
Date: January 24, 2018Return of Service of Summons on Unknown Spouse Of Carole H Smith,, served 01/12/2018
Date: January 24, 2018Certificate of Note Possession
Date: December 21, 2017Return of Service of Summons on Smith, Carole H, served 01/12/2018
Date: January 24, 2018Return of Service of Summons on Fifth Third Mortgage Company,, served 01/05/2018
Date: January 09, 2018Notice from the Court Regarding Lawsuits to Foreclose Mortgages on Homes
Date: December 20, 2017Paid $1,967.50 on receipt 900055, Fully Paid
Date: December 21, 2017Summons issued
Date: December 20, 2017Complaint
Date: December 20, 2017Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: December 20, 2017Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Of Redemption | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Foreclosure Sale on 7/11/2019 11:00:00 AM due to | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Smith, Carole H, Unknown Spouse Of Carole H Smith, Oliveri, Elise, Oliveri, Gaspare, Fifth Third Mortgage Company, Unknown Spouse Of Donna Lenski, All Unknown Parties | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 4/30/2019 8:30:00 AM due to Per Order | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Confirmation of e-mail Received by Business Observer, regarding Publication | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Foreclosure Sale | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Set on Foreclosure Sale docket 7/11/2019 beginning at 11:00 AM by Clerk (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Foreclosure Sale on 5/2/2019 11:00:00 AM due to |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.