Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
U S Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Any And All Unknown Parties, Comerica Bank, Oates, Joumana, Oates, Marc F, Saturnia Lakes Homeowners Association Inc, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Non-Service of Summons on Unknown Party 2, | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Return Of Service Of Summons On Oates, Marc F, Served 12/29/2017 | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Return Of Non-Service Of Summons On Unknown Party 1 | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Comerica Bank,, served 12/28/2017 | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Saturnia Lakes Homeowners Association Inc,, served 01/15/2018 | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Oates, Joumana, served 12/29/2017 | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Falk, Steven Mark for Saturnia Lakes Homeowners Association Inc | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense by Saturnia Lakes Homeowners Association Inc | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal & Release of Lis Pendens Oates, Marc F, Oates, Joumana, Comerica Bank,, Saturnia Lakes Homeowners Association Inc,, Any And All Unknown Parties,, Unknown Party 1,, Unknown Party 2,, Unknown Party 3,, Unknown Party 4, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.