Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stried, Christopher, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Dr Edwin Gomez, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2017 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice Medical |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Dr Edwin Gomez Recorded 2019-09-16 Instrument# 5766009 | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss - Granted - with prejudice | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Krier, Elizabeth V | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Present: Christopher Stried (Plaintiff) | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Carroll Panepinto, Heidi Beth (Defendant) | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion - For Oral Argument | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Trial - | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Withdrawing Notice of Record of No Activity | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing for Motion To Dismiss @ 8:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.