Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Julian, Sharon K, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Sharon K Julian. Bank of America is seeking damages from Julian for breaching its duty by failing to make periodic payments on a credit account. The entire balance on the account, which is $22,...
Satisfaction of Judgment
Date:Certificate of Service
Date:Certificate of Service
Date: May 25, 2018Cover Letter
Date: May 15, 2018Affidavit as to Costs
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Filing
Date: May 10, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: June 07, 2018Final Judgment on Julian, Sharon K Recorded 2018-05-15 Instrument# 5556419
Date: May 15, 2018Affidavit of Military Service for Julian, Sharon K
Date: May 10, 2018Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: May 10, 2018Motion for Final Default Judgment -
Date: May 10, 2018Default issued by clerk on Sharon K Julian
Date: March 16, 2018Order Scheduling Case Management Conference
Date: April 09, 2018Affidavit of Military Service for Julian, Sharon K
Date: March 14, 2018Return of Service of Summons on Julian, Sharon K, served 01/30/2018
Date: February 05, 2018Motion for Clerk's Default
Date: March 14, 2018Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 29, 2017Paid $410.00 on receipt 901765, Fully Paid
Date: December 29, 2017Complaint
Date: December 29, 2017Summons issued
Date: December 29, 2017Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Judgment on Julian, Sharon K Recorded 2018-05-15 Instrument# 5556419 | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Costs | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Filing | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military Service for Julian, Sharon K | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Final Default Judgment - | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Adelman, Jeralyn Sue (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.