Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maydish, Barbara, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company Inc, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Barbara Maydish against Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Inc. The complaint alleges breach of contract by the defendant. The plaintiff states that she had a policy of insurance with the defendant for...
Settlement Agreement
Date:Motion for Continuance -
Date:Witness List
Date:Motion to Compel -
Date:Cover Letter
Date:Order to Compel
Date:Request for Production
Date:Response to Motion
Date:Settlement Agreement
Date: March 18, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: March 18, 2019Notice of Cancellation of Mediation Hearing
Date: March 13, 2019Motion for Continuance -
Date: March 06, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: March 13, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 26, 2019Motion for Extension of Time -
Date: February 07, 2019Order Granting Extension of Time
Date: February 08, 2019Witness List
Date: January 08, 2019Notice of Service of Offer/Proposal of Settlement
Date: January 17, 2019Witness List
Date: January 04, 2019Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Conference
Date: November 08, 2018Agreed Case Management Plan
Date: September 17, 2018Order Approving Agreed Case Management Plan
Date: September 17, 2018Order Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager
Date: July 18, 2018Cover Letter
Date: June 13, 2018Order to Compel
Date: June 12, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 11, 2018Motion to Compel -
Date: May 23, 2018Order Granting Protective Order
Date: April 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Hearing for Motion For Protective Order
Date: March 15, 2018Response to Motion
Date: March 02, 2018Motion for Protective Order -
Date: February 19, 2018Paid $410.00 on receipt 901485, Fully Paid
Date: December 28, 2017Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 28, 2017Summons issued
Date: December 28, 2017Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 28, 2017Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company Inc | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 4/24/2019 9:00:00 AM due to per JACS - settled | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 3/18/2019 11:00:00 AM due to per JACS - settled | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Mediation Hearing | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance - | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Extension of Time |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.