Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cuba, Geover, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Geover Cuba against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company for breach of contract. Geover Cuba is the homeowner and insured under the defendant's insurance policy. The property, located at 180 10th Ave NE, Naples, FL 34120, su...
Summons issued
Date:Standing Order - Circuit
Date:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Florida Peninsula Insurance Company
Date: April 20, 2018Cover Letter
Date: February 05, 2018Order Granting Extension of Time
Date: February 05, 2018Paid $10.00 on receipt 903061, Fully Paid
Date: January 05, 2018Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 26, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: December 26, 2017Paid $400.00 on receipt 901129, Fully Paid
Date: December 28, 2017Summons issued
Date: January 04, 2018Paid $400.00 on receipt 901129, Fully Paid
Date: December 27, 2017Request for Production
Date: December 26, 2017Summons Unable to Be Issued Due to No Name Registered Agent Or Address For Defendant On Summons
Date: December 26, 2017Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 26, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: December 26, 2017Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: December 26, 2017Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Florida Peninsula Insurance Company | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Turner, Hazel Kathryn for Florida Peninsula Insurance Company | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Extension of Time | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by Florida Peninsula Insurance Company | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Goodnow, Jr James Charles for Florida Peninsula Insurance Company | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Paid $10.00 on receipt 903061, Fully Paid | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Paid $400.00 on receipt 901129, Fully Paid | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Receipt Revised |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.