Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gotera, Yudeiky, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Burt, Christopher H, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Pivacek, Cynthia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Yudeiky Gotera against Christopher H. Burt in the Circuit Court for the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Collier County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages exceeding $15,000, exclusive of interest and costs. Yudeiky Gotera, ...
Notice Trial Calendar
Date:Notice of Mediation
Date:Witness List
Date:Order for Mediation
Date:Request for Copies
Date:Standing Order - Circuit
Date:Order of Dismissal Burt, Christopher H Recorded 2019-06-20 Instrument# 5729040
Date: June 19, 2019Stipulation for Dismissal Burt, Christopher H
Date: June 13, 2019Notice Trial Calendar
Date: May 13, 2019Notice of Service of Offer/Proposal of Settlement
Date: April 15, 2019Return of Service of Subpoena
Date: April 11, 2019Statement of Issues of Fact & Law
Date: April 09, 2019Exhibit List
Date: April 09, 2019Certificate of Non-Objection
Date: April 02, 2019Return of Service of Subpoena
Date: March 26, 2019Certificate of Settlement/Mediation Authority
Date: March 25, 2019Certificate of Non-Objection
Date: March 21, 2019Notice of Production from Non-parties
Date: March 21, 2019Notice of Production from Non-parties
Date: March 12, 2019Statement of Issues of Fact & Law
Date: March 15, 2019Uniform Pretrial Conference Order
Date: March 05, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: February 26, 2019Witness List
Date: February 25, 2019Expert Witness Disclosure
Date: February 25, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: February 05, 2019Witness List
Date: January 23, 2019Return of Service of Subpoena
Date: November 07, 2018Return of Service of Subpoena
Date: November 09, 2018Return of Service of Subpoena
Date: January 04, 2019Notice of Production from Non-parties
Date: November 12, 2018Notice of Production from Non-parties
Date: October 03, 2018Certificate of Non-Objection
Date: December 21, 2018Certificate of Non-Objection
Date: October 30, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 17, 2018Order for Mediation
Date: August 30, 2018Order Setting Pretrial and Trial Cycle Commencing 060319
Date: August 28, 2018Agreed Case Management Plan and Order
Date: August 28, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 07, 2018Notice of Service of Offer/Proposal of Settlement
Date: July 02, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 28, 2018Order Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories
Date: June 08, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 08, 2018Request for Copies
Date: April 09, 2018Return of Service of Subpoena
Date: April 06, 2018Return of Service of Subpoena
Date: March 22, 2018Return of Service of Subpoena
Date: March 21, 2018Certificate of Non-Objection
Date: March 14, 2018Privilege Log by Burt, Christopher H
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories
Date: March 06, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Production from Non-parties
Date: February 20, 2018Reply to Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 29, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: January 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 24, 2018Answer, Affirmative Defense and Demand for Jury Trial by Christopher H Burt
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Appearance by Mckee, Traci for Christopher H Burt
Date: January 19, 2018Return of Service of Summons on Burt, Christopher H, served 12/23/2017
Date: December 26, 2017Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 20, 2017Paid $410.00 on receipt 900169, Fully Paid
Date: December 21, 2017Request for Production
Date: December 20, 2017Interrogatories
Date: December 20, 2017Summons issued
Date: December 20, 2017Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 20, 2017Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Burt, Christopher H Recorded 2019-06-20 Instrument# 5729040 | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Burt, Christopher H | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Trial Calendar | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Offer/Proposal of Settlement | |
April 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediator/Mediation Report - No Agreement/Impasse | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Subpoena | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Issues of Fact & Law | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Non-Objection | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Subpoena |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.