Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rhee, Violet, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Brackin, Whitney, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Violet Rhee against Whitney Brackin in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Collier County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on November 12, 2016, the defendant negligently operated a motor vehicle and ...
Trial or Hearing Notes
Date:Jury Instructions
Date:Motion in Limine -
Date:Request for Copies
Date:Objection to Subpoena
Date:Notice of Disclosure
Date:Witness List
Date:Notice of Mediation
Date:Request for Production
Date:Notice of Appearance by Upton, Florence Rose for Whitney Brackin
Date: July 22, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 09, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 08, 2019Motion in Limine -
Date: June 27, 2019Deposition Designations
Date: June 27, 2019Request for Copies
Date: June 14, 2019Order Denying Continuance
Date: June 11, 2019Copy of Attorney Issued Subpoena
Date: June 10, 2019Objection to Subpoena
Date: June 06, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 10, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 06, 2019Uniform Pretrial Conference Order
Date: May 10, 2019Copy of Attorney Issued Subpoena
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: May 23, 2019Motion for Continuance - Stipulation
Date: May 31, 2019Request for Production
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 09, 2019Motion for Continuance - Stipulation
Date: June 03, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 09, 2019Motion for Protective Order -
Date: May 16, 2019Motion for Continuance -
Date: June 03, 2019Copy of Attorney Issued Subpoena
Date: April 30, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 17, 2019Return of Service of Notice/Motion
Date: June 03, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 30, 2019Notice of Disclosure
Date: April 23, 2019Statement of Facts
Date: April 23, 2019Witness List
Date: April 09, 2019Statement of Facts
Date: April 09, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: April 09, 2019Motion to Compel -
Date: April 09, 2019Agreed Case Management Plan and Order
Date: June 22, 2018Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Conference and Docket Sounding
Date: July 03, 2018Notice of Production from Non-parties
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Physical Examination
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Physical Examination
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Service of Offer/Proposal of Settlement
Date: October 19, 2018Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: January 18, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 07, 2018Mediator/Mediation Report - No Agreement/Impasse
Date: February 07, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Service of Offer/Proposal of Settlement
Date: January 16, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: October 18, 2018Order Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager
Date: April 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories
Date: April 06, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 23, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 23, 2018Paid $410.00 on receipt 899870, Fully Paid
Date: December 20, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 04, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 08, 2018Answer, Affirmative Defense and Demand for Jury Trial by Whitney Brackin
Date: January 23, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: January 23, 2018Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 20, 2017Summons issued
Date: December 20, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: December 20, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: December 20, 2017Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 20, 2017Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 20, 2017Exhibits
Date: August 02, 2019Jury Verdict Form
Date: August 02, 2019Jury Instructions
Date: August 02, 2019Exhibit List from Trial/Hearing
Date: August 02, 2019Jury Question
Date: August 02, 2019Trial or Hearing Notes
Date: August 02, 2019Sworn Jury List
Date: August 02, 2019Jury Seating Chart
Date: August 02, 2019Judge's List
Date: August 02, 2019Trial or Hearing Notes
Date: August 01, 2019Jury Instructions
Date: July 30, 2019Jury Verdict Form
Date: July 30, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: July 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Jury Verdict Form | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Jury Instructions | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibit List from Trial/Hearing | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Jury Question | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Trial or Hearing Notes | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Sworn Jury List | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Jury Seating Chart | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge's List | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Present: Whitney Brackin (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.