Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N A, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Bosso, Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2017 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Bosso, Lisa | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Amounts Due and Owing | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment - by Wells Fargo Bank N A, | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;131937;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d6019405-7007-4e50-876c-98e02bdfac17/runs/e9f7e6ff-63f8-403f-ae98-9b8649c17400/executions/dd342412-2c0b-4d4a-a5a8-4d3f5e7a14a8/results/e6becea7-ce46-440d-97cb-e8374b9a024d/lines/195e869f-175f-444e-9b88-c5e539b3c0bd/Doc Affidavit as to Costs |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Filing | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer by Lisa Bosso | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Summons on Bosso, Lisa, served 01/04/2018 | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.