Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ollick, Andrew, Ollick, Elena G, Orange Tree Homeowners Association Inc, Unknown Parties In Possession 1, Unknown Parties In Possession 2, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Loan Documents Destroyed | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to Federal National Mortgage Association | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursement $0.00 | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale to Federal National Morgage Association | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet $100.00 Plaintiff | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Paid $70.00 on receipt 803347, Fully Paid | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Denying Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.