Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Freedom Founders Capital Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Board Of County Commisioners Collier County, Florida, Collier County, Diaz, Onelius, Lopez, Francisco R, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Evans, Christopher Robert, De Simone, Michael Peter for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Foreclosure Sale on 1/18/2018 11:00:00 AM due to | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Suggestion of Bankruptcy Santos, Osarys | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication of Notice of Sale | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Non-Jury Trial on 1/10/2018 9:00:00 AM due to Per JAC | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Confirmation of e-mail Received by Business Observer, regarding Publication | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Cenecharles, Hilda (Plaintiff) | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Foreclosure Sale docket 1/18/2018 beginning at 11:00 AM by Clerk (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Pivacek, Cynthia A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.