Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Evans, Barbara Ann, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Amo, Kent M, Kent M Amo Pa, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2016 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice Other Professional |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 11/13/2018 9:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Amo, Kent M, Kent M Amo Pa | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 11/26/2018 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 10/11/2018 10:30:00 AM due to per JACS - settled | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing For Judicial Status Conference @ 9:30 Am | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 11/13/2018 beginning at 9:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Sounding on 11/19/2018 9:30:00 AM due to per JACS - settled | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.