Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Stimolo, Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Collier County Board Of County Commissioners, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Sounding on 4/5/2018 9:30:00 AM due to per JACS - dismissal | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Jury Trial on 4/9/2018 9:30:00 AM due to per Judge's office | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial on 2/22/2018 10:30:00 AM due to per JACS - dismissal | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Collier County Board Of County Commissioners, | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non-parties | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Sounding docket 4/5/2018 beginning at 9:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Pre-Trial docket 2/22/2018 beginning at 10:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Jury Trial docket 4/9/2018 beginning at 9:30 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Conference and Docket Sounding | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Agreed Case Management Plan and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.