Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cramer, Sheri Lanette, filed a(n) Products Liability case against Ford Motor Company, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2016 |
CategoryProducts Liability |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Cancelled Case Management on 9/28/2017 1:30:00 PM due to per JACS - dismissed | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Ford Motor Company, | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Set on Case Management docket 9/28/2017 beginning at 1:30 PM Shenko, James R (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Scheduling Case Management Conference | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Offer/Proposal of Settlement | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Protective Order | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.