Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dewey, Brendan, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Kw Property Management Llc, Pacifica Loan Four Llc, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Krier, Elizabeth V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Mediation Report
Date:Notice of Filing
Date:Notice of Mediation
Date:Request for Copies
Date:Motion to Compel
Date:Notice of Disclosure
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Cancelled Case Management on 11/4/2016 10:00:00 AM due to per JACS - dismissed | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Recorded 2016-09-14 Instrument# 5312074 | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Set on Case Management docket 11/4/2016 beginning at 10:00 AM Shenko, James R (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Scheduling Case Management Conference | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Kw Property Management Llc,, Pacifica Loan Four Llc, | |
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Settlement/Mediation Authority | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.