Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Grayson, Karen, Grayson, Lace, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against The State Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2014 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
October 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Cancelled No Activity Hearing on 12/18/2015 9:30:00 AM due to | |
October 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal The State Of Florida, | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Set on No Activity Hearing docket 12/18/2015 beginning at 9:30 AM Pivacek, Cynthia A (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Record of No Activity | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Dismiss with Leave to Amend | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Pivacek, Cynthia A | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Attorney Present Yerger, Linda Kay (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.